Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 10/25/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/29/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/29/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/29/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 10/30/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/30/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/31/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/31/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/01/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/06/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/14/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/14/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/16/2007