Text: S.Res.388 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (12/17/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 388


Designating the week of February 4 through February 8, 2008, as “National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

December 5, 2007

Mr. Crapo (for himself, Mrs. Clinton, Mr. Lieberman, Ms. Murkowski, Mr. Biden, Mr. Bayh, Mr. Whitehouse, and Mr. Reed) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

December 13, 2007

Reported by Mr. Leahy, without amendment

December 17, 2007

Considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Designating the week of February 4 through February 8, 2008, as “National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week”.

    Whereas 1 in 3 female teenagers in a dating relationship has feared for her physical safety;

    Whereas 1 in 2 teenagers in a serious relationship has compromised personal beliefs to please a partner;

    Whereas 1 in 5 teenagers in a serious relationship reports having been hit, slapped, or pushed by a partner;

    Whereas 27 percent of teenagers have been in dating relationships in which their partners called them names or put them down;

    Whereas 29 percent of girls who have been in a relationship said that they have been pressured to have sex or to engage in sexual activities that they did not want;

    Whereas technologies such as cell phones and the Internet have made dating abuse both more pervasive and more hidden;

    Whereas 30 percent of teenagers who have been in a dating relationship say that they have been text-messaged between 10 and 30 times per hour by a partner seeking to find out where they are, what they are doing, or who they are with;

    Whereas 72 percent of teenagers who reported they'd been checked up on by a boyfriend or girlfriend 10 times per hour by email or text messaging did not tell their parents;

    Whereas parents are largely unaware of the cell phone and Internet harassment experienced by teenagers;

    Whereas Native American women experience higher rates of interpersonal violence than any other population group;

    Whereas violent relationships in adolescence can have serious ramifications for victims, putting them at higher risk for substance abuse, eating disorders, risky sexual behavior, suicide, and adult revictimization;

    Whereas the severity of violence among intimate partners has been shown to be greater in cases where the pattern of violence has been established in adolescence; and

    Whereas the establishment of National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week will benefit schools, communities, and families regardless of socio-economic status, race, or sex: Now, therefore be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) designates the week of February 4 through February 8, 2008, as “National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week”; and

(2) calls upon the people of the United States, high schools, law enforcement, State and local officials, and interested groups to observe National Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Week with appropriate programs and activities that promote awareness and prevention of the crime of teen dating violence in their communities.