Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/28/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/28/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/28/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/28/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/29/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/29/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 01/29/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/04/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/04/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/04/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/04/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/04/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/04/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/04/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/04/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/05/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/05/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/05/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/05/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 02/05/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/05/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/05/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/05/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/05/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/06/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/06/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/07/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/07/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/07/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 02/07/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/07/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/07/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/07/2008