Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/31/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/04/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/08/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/11/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/12/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 02/13/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/14/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/14/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/27/2008