Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/26/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/26/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/26/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/26/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/26/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/27/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/27/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/27/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/27/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/28/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 02/28/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/28/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/28/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/28/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/28/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/28/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/28/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/03/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/03/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/03/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/03/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/03/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/03/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/03/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/03/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/03/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/03/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/04/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/04/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/04/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/05/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/31/2008