Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/17/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/17/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/23/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/24/2008