Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/02/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/02/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/03/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/03/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/04/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/04/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/04/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/05/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/05/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/06/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/09/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/10/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/11/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/12/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/12/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/12/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/12/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/16/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/16/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/16/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/16/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/16/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/18/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/18/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/24/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/25/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/26/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/26/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/09/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/10/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/10/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/16/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/21/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/22/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/22/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/22/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/23/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/30/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/30/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/30/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/30/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/30/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/30/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/30/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/30/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/08/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/26/2008