Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/21/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/11/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/15/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/15/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/15/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/17/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/17/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/22/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/22/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/26/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/26/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/30/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/30/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/01/2008