Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/24/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/25/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/25/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/28/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/29/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/29/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/29/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/29/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/30/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/30/2008