Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/16/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/16/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/16/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/16/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/17/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/18/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/23/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/23/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/24/2008