Text: S.Res.719 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (12/09/2008)

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. Res. 719 Agreed to Senate (ATS)]







110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
S. RES. 719

 Recognizing National American Indian and Alaska Native Heritage Month 
and celebrating the heritage and culture of American Indians and Alaska 
Natives and the contributions of American Indians and Alaska Natives to 
                           the United States.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           November 20, 2008

 Mr. Dorgan (for himself, Ms. Murkowski, Mrs. Boxer, Mrs. Clinton, Mr. 
   Schumer, Mr. Salazar, Mr. Feingold, Mr. Tester, Mr. Domenici, Mr. 
 McCain, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Baucus, Ms. Cantwell, Mr. Nelson of Nebraska, 
Mrs. Feinstein, Mr. Bayh, Mr. Thune, Mr. Bingaman, Mr. Conrad, and Mr. 
Johnson) submitted the following resolution; which was referred to the 
                      Committee on Indian Affairs

                            December 9, 2008

             Committee discharged; considered and agreed to

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Recognizing National American Indian and Alaska Native Heritage Month 
and celebrating the heritage and culture of American Indians and Alaska 
Natives and the contributions of American Indians and Alaska Natives to 
                           the United States.

Whereas from November 1, 2008, through November 30, 2008, the United States 
        celebrates National American Indian and Alaska Native Heritage Month;
Whereas American Indians and Alaska Natives are descendants of the original, 
        indigenous inhabitants of what is now the United States;
Whereas, in 2000, the United States Census Bureau reported that there were more 
        than 4,000,000 people in the United States of American Indian and Alaska 
        Native descent;
Whereas, on December 2, 1989, the Committee on Indian Affairs of the Senate held 
        a hearing exploring the contributions of the Iroquois Confederacy, and 
        its influence on the Founding Fathers in the drafting of the 
        Constitution of the United States with the concepts of freedom of 
        speech, the separation of governmental powers, and checks and balances 
        among the branches of government;
Whereas the Senate has reaffirmed that a major national goal of the United 
        States is to provide the resources, processes, and structure that will 
        enable Indian Tribes and tribal members to obtain the quantity and 
        quality of health care services and opportunities that will eliminate 
        the health disparities between American Indians and the general 
        population of the United States;
Whereas Congress recently reaffirmed its trust responsibility to improve the 
        housing conditions and socioeconomic status of American Indians and 
        Alaska Natives by providing affordable homes in a safe and healthy 
        environment;
Whereas, throughout its course of dealing with Indian Tribes, the United States 
        Government has engaged in a government-to-government relationship with 
        Tribes;
Whereas the United States Government owes a trust obligation to Tribes, 
        acknowledged in treaties, statutes, and decisions of the Supreme Court, 
        to protect the interests and welfare of tribal governments and their 
        members;
Whereas American Indians and Alaska Natives have consistently served with honor 
        and distinction in the Armed Forces of the United States, some as early 
        as the Revolutionary War, and continue to serve in the Armed Forces in 
        greater numbers per capita than any other group in the United States;
Whereas American Indians and Alaska Natives speak and preserve indigenous 
        languages and have contributed hundreds of words to the English 
        language, including the names of people and locations in the United 
        States;
Whereas Congress has recognized Native American code talkers who served with 
        honor and distinction in World War I and World War II, using indigenous 
        languages as an unbreakable military code, saving countless American 
        lives;
Whereas American Indians and Alaska Natives are deeply rooted in tradition and 
        culture, which drives their strength of community; and
Whereas American Indians and Alaska Natives of all ages celebrate the great 
        achievements of their ancestors and heroes and continue to share their 
        stories with future generations: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the Senate--
            (1) recognizes the celebration of National American Indian 
        and Alaska Native Heritage Month during the month of November 
        2008;
            (2) honors the heritage and culture of American Indians and 
        Alaska Natives and the contributions of American Indians and 
        Alaska Natives to the United States; and
            (3) urges the people of the United States to observe 
        National American Indian and Alaska Native Heritage Month with 
        appropriate programs and activities.
                                 <all>

Share This