Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/08/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/13/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/15/2007