There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To adjust the boundaries of Pisgah National Forest in McDowell County, North Carolina.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/15/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9519)
09/10/2009Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-251.
02/11/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/16/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
09/15/2009-2:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/15/2009-2:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9519)
09/15/2009-2:42pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1002.
09/15/2009-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9519-9520)
09/15/2009-2:42pmHouseMr. Holden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/10/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
09/10/2009HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 111-251.
07/29/2009HouseSubcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry Discharged.
07/29/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/29/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/23/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/11/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
02/11/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/11/2009 Referred to
07/29/2009 Markup by
09/10/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-251
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry04/23/2009 Referred to
07/29/2009 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry09/16/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1002. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/15/2009)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pisgah National Forest Boundary Adjustment Act of 2009 - Modifies the boundaries of the Pisgah National Forest in McDowell County, North Carolina, to provide for the inclusion of certain private land and Forest Service land in the Forest. Requires an owner's consent to acquire the private land.