Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/26/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/16/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/24/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/31/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/31/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/01/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/21/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/27/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/27/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/30/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/13/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/20/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/19/2009