Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/21/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 10/20/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 12/11/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/09/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/21/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/28/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/18/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/20/2010