Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/11/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/28/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/20/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/17/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/17/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/29/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/12/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/22/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/21/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/15/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/15/2010