Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/04/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/21/2010