Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/29/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/29/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/11/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/12/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/30/2010