Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/13/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/02/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/02/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/02/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/27/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/25/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010