There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Amendments Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Amendments Act of 2009

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Amendments Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental and Native American Public Policy Act of 1992 to honor the legacy of Stewart L. Udall, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/23/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9757)
09/23/2009 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 7/27/2009 H8834)
02/12/2009 Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
10/08/2009 Senate Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/07/2009-6:14pm House House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment pursuant to H.Res. 806.
09/24/2009 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/2009 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9757)
09/23/2009 Senate S.Amdt.2546 Amendment SA 2546 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/23/2009 Senate S.Amdt.2546 Amendment SA 2546 proposed by Senator Feinstein for Senator Bingaman. (consideration: CR S9757; text: CR S9757) To strike the authorization of appropriations.
09/23/2009 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9757)
09/23/2009 Senate Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/07/2009 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
07/29/2009 Senate Received in the Senate.
07/28/2009-6:14pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2009-6:14pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/27/2009 H8834)
07/28/2009-6:13pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8935)
07/27/2009-4:04pm House At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Cassidy objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
07/27/2009-3:47pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1035.
07/27/2009-3:47pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8834-8836)
07/27/2009-3:47pm House Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/03/2009 House Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/30/2009 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/12/2009 House Referred to House Natural Resources
02/12/2009 House Referred to House Education and Labor
02/12/2009 House Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/12/2009 House Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E258)
02/12/2009 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 02/12/2009

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/12/2009 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness03/30/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/12/2009 Referred to
06/03/2009 Hearings by
Senate Environment and Public Works08/07/2009 Referred to
09/23/2009 Discharged from

Related Bills (3)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (20)

  • Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
  • Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
  • Arizona
  • Congressional tributes
  • Department of the Interior
  • District of Columbia
  • Ecology
  • Education programs funding
  • Federal officials
  • Government buildings, facilities, and property
  • Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
  • Government trust funds
  • Higher education
  • Indian social and development programs
  • Members of Congress
  • Minority education
  • Minority health
  • Policy sciences
  • Student aid and college costs

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/23/2009)

Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Amendments Act of 2009 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental and Native American Public Policy Act of 1992 to rename the Act as the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation Act.

(Sec. 3) Adds to the Act's findings to salute Stewart L. Udall's leadership in environmental and Native American policy as a member of Congress, Secretary of the Interior, environmental lawyer, and author.

(Sec. 5) Renames the Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Foundation as the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation.

Requires the Executive Director of the Foundation to be paid at a senior executive rate.

(Sec. 6) Directs the Foundation to award grants to the Udall Center for Studies in Public Policy, at the University of Arizona, to conduct training, research, and other activities with regard to the involvement of Native American and Alaska Native professionals in health care and public policy.

Refers to recipients of scholarships, fellowships, and internships under the Act as Udall Scholars, Udall Fellows, and Udall Interns, respectively. (Currently, they are known as Morris K. Udall Scholars.)

(Sec. 7) Renames the Morris K. Udall Scholarship and Excellence in National Environmental Policy Trust Fund, the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Trust Fund.

Allows the use of reasonable amounts of the Trust Fund for official reception and representation expenses, not to exceed $5,000 for a fiscal year.

(Sec. 9) Declares that the use of the Foundation or the United States Institute for Environmental Conflict Resolution for independent and impartial assessment, mediation, or other related services in connection with a dispute or conflict related to the environment, public lands, or natural resources shall not be considered the establishment or use of an advisory committee within the meaning of the Federal Advisory Committee Act.

(Sec. 10) Sets forth administrative provisions that allow the Foundation to: (1) appoint personnel without regard to federal law provisions governing appointments in the competitive service; (2) pay up to four employees, in addition to the Executive Director, at senior executive pay rates; and (3) rent office space in the District of Columbia or its environs.