Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/07/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/07/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/07/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/07/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/15/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/23/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/27/2009