Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/24/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/24/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/24/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/24/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/11/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/11/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/2010