Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/27/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/27/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/14/2009