Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/20/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/25/2010