Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/23/2009