Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/27/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/27/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/27/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/03/2009