There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Peace Corps Expansion Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Peace Corps Act to provide continued funding for the Peace Corps, to increase the readjustment allowances for Peace Corps volunteers and volunteer leaders, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/13/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/13/2009Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (133)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/25/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/25/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/25/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/19/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/18/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/13/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1066.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1066. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2009)

Peace Corps Expansion Act of 2009 - Amends the Peace Corps Act to: (1) authorize appropriations for the Peace Corps; and (2) increase readjustment allowances for Peace Corps volunteers and volunteer leaders.