Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/23/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/25/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/03/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/01/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/18/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/23/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/14/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/01/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/05/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/15/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/04/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/10/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/29/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/22/2010