Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/28/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/29/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/05/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/12/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/12/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/18/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/18/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/20/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/20/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/15/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/19/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/09/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/13/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 07/14/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/21/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/21/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/30/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/30/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/31/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 11/06/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/18/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/04/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 02/24/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/10/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/15/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/13/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/13/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/27/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/24/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/24/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/09/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/29/2010