Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/23/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/11/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/17/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/20/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2010