Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/11/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/26/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/06/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/06/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/12/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/17/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/13/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/01/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/03/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/14/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/03/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/04/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/04/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/04/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/04/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/04/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/04/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/04/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 02/04/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 02/25/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/03/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/21/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/18/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/28/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/30/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/23/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/18/2010