Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/03/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/19/2009