Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/22/2010