Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/18/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/18/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/18/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/25/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/18/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/18/2009