Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/17/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/23/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/25/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/08/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/29/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/05/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/06/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/01/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/30/2010