Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/22/2010