Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/08/2009