Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/18/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/18/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/29/2010