Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/07/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/07/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/07/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/13/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/13/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/13/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/26/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/12/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/03/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/12/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/12/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/14/2009