Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/28/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/14/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/14/2010