Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/03/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/11/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/11/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/27/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/02/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/01/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/09/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/27/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010