Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/08/2009