Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/23/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 12/09/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew