There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Save Our Small and Seasonal Businesses Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the termination date for the exemption of returning workers from the numerical limitations for temporary workers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/23/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/16/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/23/2009Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/23/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/14/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/23/2009 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law03/16/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1136. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/23/2009)

Save Our Small and Seasonal Businesses Act of 2009 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to exempt certain returning H-2B aliens (temporary nonagricultural worker) from annual numerical limitations.