Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/13/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew