Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/16/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2009