Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/04/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/10/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/10/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/19/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/26/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2009