Text: H.R.1149 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/24/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1149


To reauthorize the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

February 24, 2009

Ms. Ginny Brown-Waite of Florida (for herself, Mr. Bilbray, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, and Mr. Boozman) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary


A BILL

To reauthorize the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Child Protection Reauthorization Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. Reauthorization of child protection programs in the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006.

The Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 (42 U.S.C. 16901 et seq.) is amended as follows:

(1) SEX OFFENDER MANAGEMENT ASSISTANCE (SOMA) PROGRAM.—Section 126(d) (42 U.S.C. 16926(d)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”.

(2) FEDERAL ASSISTANCE WITH RESPECT TO VIOLATIONS OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENTS.—Section 142(b) (42 U.S.C. 16941(b)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”.

(3) PILOT PROGRAM FOR MONITORING SEXUAL OFFENDERS.—Section 621(c) (42 U.S.C. 16981) is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”; and

(B) in paragraph (2), by inserting “and after September 1, 2012, but not later than September 1, 2013,” after “September 1, 2010,”.

(4) GRANTS TO COMBAT SEXUAL ABUSE OF CHILDREN.—Section 625(d) (42 U.S.C. 16983(d)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”.

(5) JESSICA LUNSFORD ADDRESS VERIFICATION GRANT PROGRAM.—Section 631(e) (42 U.S.C. 16988(e)) is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”; and

(B) in paragraph (2), by inserting “and after April 1, 2011, but not later than April 1, 2012,” after “April 1, 2009,”.

(6) FUGITIVE SAFE SURRENDER.—Section 632(c) (42 U.S.C. 16989(c)) is amended by striking “this section—” and all that follows through the period and inserting “this section $8,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 2010 through 2012.”.

SEC. 3. Reauthorization of sex offender apprehension grants and juvenile sex offender treatment grants.

Part KK of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (relating to sex offender apprehension grants; juvenile sex offender treatment grants), is amended—

(1) in section 3011(b) (42 U.S.C. 3797ee(b)), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”; and

(2) in section 3012(c) (42 U.S.C. 3797ee–1(c)), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2012”.