Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/24/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/24/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/31/2009