Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/31/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/2010